Ferguson, Karen Elizabeth (CPSO#: 71118)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1999


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Carleton Family Health Team
119 Langstaff Drive
P O Box 218
Carp ON  K0A 1L0
Phone: (613) 839-3271
Fax: (613) 839-3273
Electoral District: 07


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. KAREN ELIZABETH FERGUSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERGUSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 06 Sep 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1999