Ferguson, Robert Donald Genier (CPSO#: 51914)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 25 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 17 Sep 1986 to 31 Dec 1986
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 1986
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 19 Sep 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jan 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 2001