Ferlisi, Mary-Claire (CPSO#: 77586)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
10425 Kennedy Road North
Brampton ON  L6Z 0A4
Phone: (905) 846-7611
Fax: (905) 846-7753
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY-CLAIRE FERLISI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERLISI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2004