Fernandes, Emily Claire Silva (CPSO#: 108880)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 23 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St. Matthew's University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Psychiatry
Room 4418
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  M4G 0A1
Phone: (613) 737-8955
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMILY CLAIRE SILVA FERNANDES shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. FERNANDES is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. FERNANDES shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. FERNANDES is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. FERNANDES shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. FERNANDES is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. FERNANDES no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Sep 2016
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018