Fernandes, Fernanda Padrao (CPSO#: 92161)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 24 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Federal University of Rio De Janerio, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 02 Dec 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 03 Dec 2009 to 30 Sep 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2010 to 24 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Dec 2010