Fernandes, Hubert Cyril (CPSO#: 89784)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 13 Jul 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Kasturba Medical College, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hubert Cyril Fernandes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Fernandes ( CPSO# 89784 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 20 Aug 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Apr 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 12 Jan 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 15 Apr 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Apr 2011 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.   Hubert   Cyril   Fernandes   may   practise   medicine  independently  in
            Anaesthesiology, only.