Fernandes, John Roque (CPSO#: 53412)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Regional Forensic Pathology Unit
General Site
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 46530
Fax: (905) 524-2681
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John R. Fernandes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 12 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Fernandes ( CPSO# 53412 )

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 14 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
General Pathology Effective: 29 May 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN ROQUE FERNANDES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERNANDES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1983