Fernandes, Vinay Thomas (CPSO#: 93061)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 401
520 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1R 0B1
Phone: (416) 673-9393
Fax: (416) 673-9394
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

600 University Ave., Rm. 401
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: 416-586-8533
Fax: 416-586-8600
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite 2204
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V1
Canada
Phone: (416) 289-1225
Fax: (416) 289-0970
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

685 Sheppard Ave East Suite 402
Toronto ON  M2K 1B6
Canada
Phone: 4164995558
Fax: 4164999392
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vinay T. Fernandes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Fernandes ( CPSO# 93061 )

Business Address:
520 Ellesmere Road
Suite 401
Toronto ON  M1R 0B1
Phone Number: (416) 673-9393

Business Address:
600 University Avenue
Suite 401
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-8533

Business Address:
685 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 402
Toronto ON  M2K 1B6

Business Address:
Suite 2204
3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VINAY THOMAS FERNANDES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERNANDES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016