Fernandez, Alcantro Bartholomeu Albino (CPSO#: 22038)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Sep 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1969

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Swahili

Education:University of Dublin, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
60 Centennial Parkway South
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 2C5
Phone: (905) 662-2231
Fax: (905) 662-2233
Electoral District: 04

Medical Records Location

Address: c/o Dr. Maliha Ali Hass Sherman 60 Centennial Parkway South Stoney Creek ON L8G 2C5
Date Received: 04 Mar 2016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALCANTRO BARTHOLOMEU ALBINO FERNANDEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERNANDEZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1969
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Apr 1997
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 30 Sep 1997

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 09 Dec 1996
Summary:

 In December 1996, Dr. Fernandez pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined 
 in s. 34(3)(c) of the Medical Act, 1970, as amended, in that he had been guilty of misconduct in a 
 professional respect and of conduct unbecoming a medical practitioner.  Dr. Fernandez also pleaded 
 guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulations 577/75, and 
 448/80, in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having 
 regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
 dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 26(31) and s. 27(32), respectively.  The Committee 
 accepted Dr. Fernandez( guilty pleas based on an Agreed Statement of Facts and found him guilty of 
 professional misconduct.

The Committee ordered the following penalty:

1)	Dr. Fernandez was to be 
 reprimanded with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.

2)	Dr. Fernandez( 
 certificate of registration was to be suspended for a period of six months.  The period of 
 suspension shall commence on a date which shall be fixed by the Registrar, who shall take this 
 action within 60 days of the date on which this Order becomes final.  In any event, the term of 
 this suspension shall commence not more than 180 days after the date on which this order becomes 
 final.

3)	Dr. Fernandez was to pay a fine of $5,000.00 within 60 days of the Order becoming 
 final.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Dec 09, 1996