Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Fernandez, Christina D (CPSO#: 58810)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
299 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J3
Phone: (613) 257-2311
Fax: (613) 253-0044
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Carleton Place and District
Memorial Hospital
211 Lake Avenue
Box 476
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4
Canada
Phone: (613) 257-2200
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fernandez Marion Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Marion ( CPSO# 58812 )
Dr. C. Fernandez ( CPSO# 58810 )

Business Address:
299 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J3
Phone Number: (613) 257-2311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINA D FERNANDEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERNANDEZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Oct 2009 to 24 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1987