Fernandez, Gabriel (CPSO#: 18342)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Valladolid, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 1960
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003