Fernando, Anna Alexeyevna (CPSO#: 85197)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 Aug 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:First Leningrad Medical Institute, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Fernando Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 4 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Docudavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto ON M6B 3Z4 Tel: 416-781-9083
Date Received: 31 May 2016

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 30 Apr 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 30 Apr 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from April 30, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Anna Alexeyevna
            Fernando in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Fernando to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Fernando has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all
                  jurisdictions.