Fernando, Judith (CPSO#: 95299)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: Halwala, Madupriyani Judith (used until: 11 Mar 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Latvian State University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUDITH FERNANDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERNANDO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Jan 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 16 Jan 2012 to 23 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 24 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2017