Fernando, M Nilanga G (CPSO#: 91957)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Aug 2009

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 27 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Queen's University
70 Barrie Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: 613-533-2543
Electoral District: 06

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. M NILANGA G FERNANDO shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. FERNANDO is enrolled at QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. FERNANDO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. FERNANDO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. FERNANDO shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. FERNANDO is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. FERNANDO no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 04 Aug 2009 to 26 Oct 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 27 Oct 2009 to 15 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 16 Sep 2010 to 15 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 16 Sep 2011 to 15 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 16 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018