Fernando, Manthrihewage Lakshman Dayasundara (CPSO#: 53811)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Apr 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhalese

Education:University of Ceylon, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M.L.D. Fernando Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 3 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Woodstock Hospital 310 Juliana Drive Woodstock ON N4V 0A4
Date Received: 26 Apr 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 10 May 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Apr 2017