Ferrari, Robert (CPSO#: 62733)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
United Health Center
Unit 103
7609 109 Street Northwest
Edmonton AB  T6G 1C3
Phone: (780) 761-9111

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009