Ferreira, Bernard Eugene (CPSO#: 20528)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 28 Nov 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1966
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014