Ferretti, Emanuela (CPSO#: 87797)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 02 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:Universita di Milano, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Neonatology
Room 8259
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8561
Fax: (613) 737-8889
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Children's Hospital of Eastern Onta
401 Smyth Road
Division of Neonatology
Rm3421
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2415
Fax: (613) 738-4847
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ferretti Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ferretti ( CPSO# 87797 )

Business Address:
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Neonatology
Room 8259
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Italy
Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 15 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMANUELA FERRETTI may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DIVISION OF NEONATAL-PERINATAL MEDICINE, DEPARTMENT OF PAEDIATRICS, UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA in which Dr. FERRETTI holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. FERRETTI may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. FERRETTI no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. FERRETTI no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. FERRETTI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2010