Ferreyra Galliani, Mariella (CPSO#: 96937)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Oct 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad San Martin De Porres, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
300 Rossland Road East
Ajax ON  L1Z 0M1
Phone: 905-239-7663
Fax: 905-239-4664
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

5292 Yonge Street
North York ON  M2N 5P9
Canada
Phone: (416) 223-6666
Fax: 4162235335
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Peru

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIELLA FERREYRA GALLIANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERREYRA GALLIANI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 25 Oct 2011 to 16 Jan 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 17 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2013