Ferris, Frank Douglas (CPSO#: 50545)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Ohio

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1981 to 15 Jun 1982
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Sep 1990
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1990 to 30 Nov 1990
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Dec 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 2017