Fetterly, Alexander Charles (CPSO#: 30395)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 10 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 2415 Marlene Stewart Street London ON N6K 5R3
Date Received: 18 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 29 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jul 2017