Fettes, Ian William (CPSO#: 24307)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 16 Mar 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Mar 2015


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian Fettes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 13 2015


Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 13 Mar 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Mar 2015