Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Feuer, Catherine Frances (CPSO#: 56759)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Towne Centre Medical Clinic
Suite 201
3601 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3R 0M3
Phone: (905) 604-3336
Fax: (905) 604-7750
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Yorkville Vein Clinic Inc.
404-1240 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5R 2A7
Canada
Phone: (416) 927-0533
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Feuer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 16 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Feuer ( CPSO# 56759 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
3601 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3R 0M3
Phone Number: (905) 604-3336

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE FRANCES FEUER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEUER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1987