Feyles, Valter (CPSO#: 68494)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Aug 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Turin, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Procrea Fertility Centre
Suite 400
955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone: (289) 357-0100 Ext. 5223
Fax: (289) 357-0101
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Procrea Fertility Newmarket
72 Prospect St
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3T2
Canada
Phone: (905) 967-0852
Fax: (905) 967-0512
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Valter Feyles Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Feyles ( CPSO# 68494 )

Business Address:
Suite 400
955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone Number: (289) 357-0100

Business Address:
72 Prospect Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3T2
Phone Number: (905) 967-0852

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Room E3-619A
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 663-3019

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 28 May 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VALTER FEYLES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEYLES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1995