Fiala, Thomas George Sigmund (CPSO#: 65671)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 08 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Plastic Surgery Effective: 28 Aug 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 1996