Fialkov, Jeffrey Allan (CPSO#: 60807)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Ctre
Division of Plastic Surgery
M1 516
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4257
Fax: (416) 480-4224
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

195 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5R 2J3
Canada
Phone: (416) 929-1618
Fax: (416) 929-0736
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

362 Fairlawn Avenue
Toronto ON  M5M 1T6
Canada
Phone: 4162565614
Fax: (416) 256-4194
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey A. Fialkov Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Fialkov ( CPSO# 60807 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Plastic Surgery
M1-516
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4257

Business Address:
362 Fairlawn Avenue
Toronto ON  M5M 1T6
Phone Number: (647) 931-5358

Business Address:
195 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5R 2J3
Phone Number: (416) 929-1618

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 28 Aug 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY ALLAN FIALKOV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FIALKOV is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1990