Fidal, Samuil Wadie (CPSO#: 78140)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Apr 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Apr 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alexandria, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Park Medical Clinic
Unit D 2
2355 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M6M 4A2
Phone: (416) 244-4377
Fax: (416) 244-1004
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Weston Road Medical Clinic
2549 Weston Road
Toronto ON  M9N 2A7
Canada
Phone: (416) 240-8282
Fax: 4162408870
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samuil Fidal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Fidal ( CPSO# 78140 )

Business Address:
Weston Road Clinic
2549 Weston Road
Toronto ON  M9N 2A7
Phone Number: (416) 240-8282

Business Address:
North Park Medical Centre
2355 Keele Street
Unit D 2
Toronto ON  M6M 4A2
Phone Number: (416) 244-4377

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMUIL WADIE FIDAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FIDAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Jan 2003
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2005