Fidler, Wesley Keith (CPSO#: 60626)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St . Joseph's Hospital
35 North Algoma Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5G7
Phone: (807) 346-8467
Fax: (807) 346-7010
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wesley Fidler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Fidler ( CPSO# 60626 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph Hospital
35 North Algoma Street
PO Box 3251
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5G3
Phone Number: (807) 346-8467

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 23 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WESLEY KEITH FIDLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FIDLER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Rheumatology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1990