Fielden, Robert Harry Newell (CPSO#: 16228)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Sep 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
21 Queensway W
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Phone: (905) 897-8928
Fax: (905) 897-9229
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 700 1235 Bay St
Toronto ON  M5R 3K4
Canada
Phone: 416 934 1053
Fax: 416 934 0457
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Minnesota

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 26 Nov 1963 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT HARRY NEWELL FIELDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FIELDEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1957
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Aug 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1998