Figaro, Alexandra (CPSO#: 69904)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Dec 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 1998

Summary

Former Name: Figaro-Alce, Alexandra (used until: 12 Sep 2005 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
500 Manning Rd
Unit 6 C
Tecumseh ON  N8N 5H3
Phone: (519) 979 5171
Fax: (519) 979 5141
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

University of Windsor
Student Health Services - CAW bld
401 Sunset avenue
Windsor
Windsor ON  N9B 3P4
Canada
Phone: (519) 973 7002
Fax: (519) 971-3637
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alexandra Figaro Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Figaro ( CPSO# 69904 )

Business Address:
6A - 500 Manning Road
Tecumseh ON  N8N 5H3
Phone Number: (519) 979-5171

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA FIGARO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FIGARO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 20 Oct 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 19 Oct 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1998