Figueredo, Alvaro Tell (CPSO#: 27580)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 20 Dec 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of the Republic, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Figueredo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 27 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Dec 2014