Figueroa, Max Ernesto (CPSO#: 78894)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Feb 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universidad Autonoma de Centro America, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2003 to 23 May 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 24 May 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 28 Feb 2005
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 May 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2005