Filanovsky, Yevgeny Igorevich (CPSO#: 78946)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Russian

Education:University of Alberta, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Filanovsky & Simice Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 24 2007

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008