Filate, Woganee A (CPSO#: 86768)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Sleep and Pulmonary Centre
123 Edward Street
Suie 1011
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone: (416) 813-2277
Fax: (416) 260-3203
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sleep Care Solutions Davisville
1835 Yonge Street
Suite 303
Toronto ON  M4S 1X8
Canada
Phone: (416) 792-9436
Fax: (416) 792-9436
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 2014
Toronto ON  M2K 2W2
Canada
Phone: (416) 229-2315
Fax: (416) 223-9828
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Woganee Filate Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Filate ( CPSO# 86768 )

Business Address:
Toronto Sleep and Pulmonary Centre
Suite 1011
123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone Number: (416) 260-3203

Business Address:
Sleep Care Solutions Davisville
Suite 303
1835 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 792-9436

Business Address:
Sleep Care Solutions Scarborough
Suite 208
4235 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1S 1T7
Phone Number: (416) 292-3218

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 07 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WOGANEE A FILATE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FILATE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011