Filipich, Rudy Louis (CPSO#: 19646)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 16 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jan 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jun 1998