Fillingham, Kathryn Ann (CPSO#: 59836)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5230 Mitch Owens Road
Manotick ON  K4M 0E2
Phone: (613) 692-2571
Fax: (613) 692-0271
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fillingham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Fillingham ( CPSO# 59836 )

Business Address:
Manotick Medical Centre
5230 Mitch Owens Road
Manotick ON  K4M 1B2
Phone Number: (613) 692-2571

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHRYN ANN FILLINGHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FILLINGHAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1989