Filomeno De Figueiredo, Antonia (CPSO#: 68006)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Konkani, Portuguese

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
622 College Street
Toronto ON  M6G 1B6
Phone: (416) 534-4455
Fax: (416) 534-2437
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JS Sachdeva Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Filomeno De Figueiredo ( CPSO# 68006 )
Dr. J. Sachdeva ( CPSO# 66594 )

Business Address:
Suite 101
3 Conestoga Drive
Brampton ON  L6Z 4N5
Phone Number: (905) 453-0715

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTONIA FILOMENO DE FIGUEIREDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FILOMENO DE FIGUEIREDO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1996