Findlater, Andrew Ross (CPSO#: 29114)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1985 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Dec 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 1996