Findlay, Jay Max (CPSO#: 50551)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 14 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jun 2000