Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Findlay, Peter Murray (CPSO#: 63932)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2nd Floor
333 Lakeshore Road West
Mississauga ON  L5H 1G9
Phone: (905) 274-7044
Fax: (905) 274-0227
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P.M. Findlay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Findlay ( CPSO# 63932 )

Business Address:
Medical Associates of Port Credit
333 Lakeshore Road West
2nd Floor
Mississauga ON  L5H 1G9
Phone Number: (905) 274-7044

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER MURRAY FINDLAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINDLAY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1992