Findlay, Sheri Michelle (CPSO#: 69573)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences Corp
Department of Paediatrics
H.S.C. - 3A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75658
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Findlay-Meaney Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Meaney ( CPSO# 69377 )
Dr. S. Findlay ( CPSO# 69573 )

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
Department of Pediatrics
1200 Main Street West
Room 3A
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Care
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHERI MICHELLE FINDLAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINDLAY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1997