Fine, Nowell Mark (CPSO#: 80670)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 16 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jun 2010