Finelli, Antonio (CPSO#: 70113)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Nov 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Nov 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3-130
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2851
Fax: (416) 946-6590
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tony Finelli Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Finelli ( CPSO# 70113 )

Business Address:
3-130 - 610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2851

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTONIO FINELLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINELLI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2004