Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Finestone, Hillel Moses (CPSO#: 52725)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
43 Bruyere Street
Dept. of PM&R
2nd floor
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone: (613) 562-6094
Fax: (613) 562-6312
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Hospital General Campus
The Rehabilitation Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. #75591
Fax: (613) 562-6312
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Finestone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Finestone ( CPSO# 52725 )

Business Address:
Elisabeth Bruyere Hospital
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone Number: (613) 562-6094

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
The Rehabilitation Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M2
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 29 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HILLEL MOSES FINESTONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINESTONE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1985