Fink, Napoleon Richard Telesphore (CPSO#: 14747)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 1999

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1954
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1988
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1988
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 1999

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 16 Oct 1986
Summary:

 In October 1986, Dr. Fink pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 
 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of 
 practice of the profession.  The Discipline Committee accepted this plea, and found Dr. Fink 
 guilty of professional misconduct.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Fink's licence be 
 suspended for a period of six months, but that the final three months of this suspension would 
 themselves be suspended, provided that the Doctor submitted to an investigation of his practice 
 under s. 64 of the Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended, on a date to be fixed by the 
 Registrar.  The Committee further ruled that a condition be imposed on Dr. Fink's licence, 
 restricting him from prescribing narcotic drugs for as long as he practised medicine.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 23 Nov 1987
Hearing Date(s): 15 Oct 1986