Finkelman, Shayna Reva (CPSO#: 86434)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 216
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 498-9841
Fax: (416) 498-3114
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4700 Keele Street
York University
North York ON  M3J 1P3
Canada
Phone: (647) 722-2370
Fax: (416) 367-4301
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAYNA REVA FINKELMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINKELMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2009