Finkelstein, Harvey (CPSO#: 51642)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3029 Carling Avenue
Suite 204
Ottawa ON  K2B 8E8
Phone: (613) 820-2518
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Finkelstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Finkelstein ( CPSO# 51642 )

Business Address:
Suite 204
3029 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2B 8E8
Phone Number: (613) 820-2518

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 18 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARVEY FINKELSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINKELSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1985