Finkelstein, Joel Alan (CPSO#: 59757)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room MG361
North York ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6774
Fax: (416) 480-4705
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joel Finkelstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Finkelstein ( CPSO# 59757 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room MG361
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6774

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Washington

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 08 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOEL ALAN FINKELSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINKELSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1989