Finkelstein, Sandy (CPSO#: 59686)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough and Rouge Hospital,
Birchmount Division, GIM Clinic
Toronto, Ontario M1W 3W3
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2465
Fax: (416) 495-2420
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDY FINKELSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINKELSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1989