Finkenzeller, Kristin Lindsay (CPSO#: 82882)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brockville General Hospital
1st Floor West
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone: (613) 498-0740
Fax: (613) 345-3036
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kristin Finkenzeller Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Finkenzeller ( CPSO# 82882 )

Business Address:
Brockville General Hospital
1st Floor West
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 498-0740

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTIN LINDSAY FINKENZELLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINKENZELLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010